NY A08655 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides beach access routes for mobility impaired persons on all public state and local beaches up to the median high tide level at tidal beaches; mean high water level at river beaches; or normal recreation water level at lake, pond, and reservoir beaches.
Title
Provides beach access routes for mobility impaired persons on all public state and local beaches up to the median high tide level at tidal beaches; mean high water level at river beaches; or normal recreation water level at lake, pond, and reservoir beaches.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | held for consideration in tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S06841 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE