NY A08672 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - print number 8672a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - print number 8672a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain crimes relating to the disposal, possession and acceptance of solid waste and hazardous materials, including the crimes of criminal disposal, scheme to defraud by disposal of solid waste, criminal possession of solid waste, criminal acceptance of solid waste or construction and demolition material, and criminal acceptance of solid waste containing a hazardous and acutely hazardous substance; establishes crimes relating to sand mining including scheme to defraud by sand mining, criminal sand mining and criminal disposal incident to sand mining.
Title
Establishes certain crimes relating to the disposal, possession and acceptance of solid waste and hazardous materials, including the crimes of criminal disposal, scheme to defraud by disposal of solid waste, criminal possession of solid waste, criminal acceptance of solid waste or construction and demolition material, and criminal acceptance of solid waste containing a hazardous and acutely hazardous substance; establishes crimes relating to sand mining including scheme to defraud by sand mining, criminal sand mining and criminal disposal incident to sand mining.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Assembly | print number 8672a |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06758 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.38