NY A08676 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s6929a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s6929a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to a limited license for clinical laboratory technology.
Title
Extends provisions relating to a limited license for clinical laboratory technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s6929a |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.62 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.62 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | print number 8676a |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06929 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.194