NY A08703 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the use of canines for contraband screening at correctional facilities housing one hundred or more inmates.
Title
Requires the use of canines for contraband screening at correctional facilities housing one hundred or more inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in correction |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07640 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION