NY A08704 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - signed chap.466
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - signed chap.466
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the official state hymn of remembrance in honor of all American veterans shall be "Here Rests in Honored Glory".
Title
Provides that the official state hymn of remembrance in honor of all American veterans shall be "Here Rests in Honored Glory".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | signed chap.466 |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1850 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6856A |
2018-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.167 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.167 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | print number 8704a |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-10-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06856 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8704A