NY A08723 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Chazy lake as an inland waterway for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Chazy lake as an inland waterway for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.234 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.797 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6895A |
2018-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.746 |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-25 | Assembly | print number 8723a |
2018-01-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-10-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06895 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8723A