NY A08724 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the deadline for tax exemption applications for certain improved properties affected by Superstorm Sandy from March 1, 2018 until March 1, 2020.
Title
Extends the deadline for tax exemption applications for certain improved properties affected by Superstorm Sandy from March 1, 2018 until March 1, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.130 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1570 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7339 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.800 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-10-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07339 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8724