NY A08732 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the manufacture and sale of ice cream or other frozen desserts made with liquor.
Title
Authorizes the manufacture and sale of ice cream or other frozen desserts made with liquor.
Sponsors
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] |
Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.132 |
2020-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-03-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.463 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | substituted for a8732 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.335 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | substituted by s7013 |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.463 |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S07013 (Same As) 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.132