NY A08740 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission to rename the Robert Moses State Park to reflect on the history of Long Island.
Title
Establishes a commission to rename the Robert Moses State Park to reflect on the history of Long Island.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 8740a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |