NY A08758 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-26 - signed chap.121
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-26 - signed chap.121
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Sean Ralston, a part-time village of Altamont police officer in the county of Albany, to take the civil service examination for full-time police officer, and to be placed on the eligible list for appointment if his score on the examination is high enough.
Title
Authorizes Sean Ralston, a part-time village of Altamont police officer in the county of Albany, to take the civil service examination for full-time police officer, and to be placed on the eligible list for appointment if his score on the examination is high enough.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | Senate | signed chap.121 |
2018-07-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-07 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1164 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6908 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.918 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-11-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06908 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8758