NY A08806 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the certification of the final state equalization rate, class ratios, and class equalization rates, if required, shall occur no later than thirty days prior to the last date set by law for levy of taxes of any municipal corporation to which such equalization rate, class ratios, and class equalization rates are applicable.
Title
Requires that the certification of the final state equalization rate, class ratios, and class equalization rates, if required, shall occur no later than thirty days prior to the last date set by law for levy of taxes of any municipal corporation to which such equalization rate, class ratios, and class equalization rates are applicable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.132 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.280 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6958 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.919 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-11-27 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06958 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8806