NY A08808 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - print number 8808b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - print number 8808b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the retail sale of flavored tobacco products and accessories and imposes a fine of not more than five hundred dollars for each infraction.
Title
Prohibits the retail sale of flavored tobacco products and accessories and imposes a fine of not more than five hundred dollars for each infraction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | print number 8808b |
2020-10-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2020-09-09 | Assembly | print number 8808a |
2020-09-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06809 (Same As) 2020-09-30 - PRINT NUMBER 6809B