NY A08819 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of lymphedema information to patients at high risk of developing lymphedema and lists which patients are considered high risk.
Title
Relates to the distribution of lymphedema information to patients at high risk of developing lymphedema and lists which patients are considered high risk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.283 |
2018-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1950 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7765B |
2018-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.106 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.106 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | print number 8819b |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | print number 8819a |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07765 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8819B