NY A08821 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the Cedarmore Corporation for community programs.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of general services to transfer and convey certain unappropriated state land to the Cedarmore Corporation for community programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-29 | Senate | vetoed memo.573 |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1661 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.282 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.282 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | print number 8821a |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |