NY A08827 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the St. Regis river as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates the St. Regis river as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.160 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.80 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | substituted for a8827 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.556 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s6715 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.80 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06715 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.160