NY A08829 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of trichloroethylene as a vapor degreaser, an intermediate chemical to produce other chemicals, a refrigerant, or an extraction solvent or in any other manufacturing or industrial cleaning process or use beginning December 1, 2021.
Title
Prohibits the use of trichloroethylene as a vapor degreaser, an intermediate chemical to produce other chemicals, a refrigerant, or an extraction solvent or in any other manufacturing or industrial cleaning process or use beginning December 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.66 |
2020-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.370 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.316 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a8829a |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.805 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6829B |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6829A |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-11-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s6829b |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.316 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.316 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-07-18 | Assembly | print number 8829a |
2020-07-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06829 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.66