NY A08869 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides immunity from prosecution for certain individuals engaged in prostitution who are victims of or witnesses to a crime and who report such crime or assist in the investigation or prosecution.
Title
Provides immunity from prosecution for certain individuals engaged in prostitution who are victims of or witnesses to a crime and who report such crime or assist in the investigation or prosecution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08927 (Same As) 2020-08-19 - REFERRED TO RULES