NY A08873 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.241
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.241
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a historic business preservation registry to serve as an educational and promotional tool to recognize historic community-serving businesses as valuable cultural assets.
Title
Establishes a historic business preservation registry to serve as an educational and promotional tool to recognize historic community-serving businesses as valuable cultural assets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.241 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.475 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | substituted for a8873a |
2020-07-21 | Senate | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7274B |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.450 |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 7274A |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7274b |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.475 |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | print number 8873a |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S07274 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.241