NY A08895 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rate paid by the state to a city for maintenance and repair of highways.
Title
Relates to the rate paid by the state to a city for maintenance and repair of highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-12-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04048 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.146
A05990 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.146
S07701 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
A05990 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.146
S07701 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE