NY A08903 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the power to revoke or suspend the license of a real estate broker or salesman.
Title
Relates to the power to revoke or suspend the license of a real estate broker or salesman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.131 |
2020-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.318 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a8903a |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.808 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6874A |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s6874a |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.318 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.318 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | print number 8903a |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-12-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06874 (Same As) 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.131