NY A08951 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing microchipping standards, registration of microchips and the examination of seized animals; provides for the expiration of an advisory committee on microchipping.
Title
Relates to establishing microchipping standards, registration of microchips and the examination of seized animals; provides for the expiration of an advisory committee on microchipping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted by s7317 |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.660 |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S07317 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.36