NY A08963 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.541
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.541
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state uniform fire prevention and building code to address standards for the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in restaurants and other commercial buildings; requires the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in restaurants and other commercial buildings.
Title
Requires the New York state uniform fire prevention and building code to address standards for the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in restaurants and other commercial buildings; requires the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in restaurants and other commercial buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | signed chap.541 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1056 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6657C |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.181 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.181 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | print number 8963a |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |