NY A08979 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-29 - SIGNED CHAP.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-29 - SIGNED CHAP.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Places restrictions on the sale and use of firefighting equipment containing PFAS chemicals to reduce the use of PFAS chemicals in firefighting activities; repeals certain provisions of the executive law related to reducing the use of PFAS chemicals in firefighting activities.
Title
Places restrictions on the sale and use of firefighting equipment containing PFAS chemicals to reduce the use of PFAS chemicals in firefighting activities; repeals certain provisions of the executive law related to reducing the use of PFAS chemicals in firefighting activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.88 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-02-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.374 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | substituted for a8979 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.91 |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | substituted by s7167 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.374 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07167 (Same As) 2020-04-29 - SIGNED CHAP.88