NY A08986 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the commission to designate any commercial mobile radio or cellular telephone service providers as an eligible telecommunications carrier for purposes of providing lifeline service.
Title
Allows the commission to designate any commercial mobile radio or cellular telephone service providers as an eligible telecommunications carrier for purposes of providing lifeline service.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.13 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-01-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-28 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.342 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | substituted for a8986 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.15 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | substituted by s6936 |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.342 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06936 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.13