NY A08991 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "women on corporate boards study", in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to enacting the "women on corporate boards study", in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.17 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-01-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-28 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.345 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | substituted for a8991 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.119 |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | substituted by s7195 |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.345 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07195 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.17