NY A08994 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes factors and requirements to be considered when a health care practitioner's opinion differs from that of an applicant's treating health care practitioner's opinion as to an applicant's disability.
Title
Establishes factors and requirements to be considered when a health care practitioner's opinion differs from that of an applicant's treating health care practitioner's opinion as to an applicant's disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.346 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S07207 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES