NY A08996 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.
Title
Establishes a small business tax credit for the employment of disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.347 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07296 (Same As) 2020-01-16 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE