NY A09004 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7328
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notice of determination of eligibility for medical assistance; provides for written notice and additional electronic information.
Title
Relates to notice of determination of eligibility for medical assistance; provides for written notice and additional electronic information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7328 |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.807 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07328 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.435