NY A09034 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-11)
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a prescription for a schedule II, III, or IV controlled substance to be partially filled at the request of the prescriber or patient.
Title
Allows a prescription for a schedule II, III, or IV controlled substance to be partially filled at the request of the prescriber or patient.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.74 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-25 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-02-25 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-25 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.408 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | substituted for a9034 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.174 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | substituted by s7115 |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.408 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07115 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.74