NY A09036 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - substituted by s7082
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the time in which to file a claim relating to certain child sexual abuse cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the time in which to file a claim relating to certain child sexual abuse cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted by s7082
2020-05-27Assemblyrules report cal.25
2020-05-27Assemblyreported
2020-05-26Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-01-10Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S07082 (Same As) 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.130

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback