NY A09052 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the towns of Lorraine and Worth in Jefferson county to elect a single town justice to preside in the town courts of both towns.
Title
Authorizes the towns of Lorraine and Worth in Jefferson county to elect a single town justice to preside in the town courts of both towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.271 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.85 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | substituted for a9052 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.457 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s6873 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.85 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06873 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.271