NY A09057 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that altered motor vehicles commonly referred to as "stretch limousines" which were altered on or after January 1, 2021, shall have at least two safety belts for the front seat and at least one safety belt for the rear seat for each passenger for which the rear seat of such vehicle was designed.
Title
Provides that altered motor vehicles commonly referred to as "stretch limousines" which were altered on or after January 1, 2021, shall have at least two safety belts for the front seat and at least one safety belt for the rear seat for each passenger for which the rear seat of such vehicle was designed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.10 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.79 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6191C |
2020-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.7 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.7 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06191 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.10