NY A09058 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires stretch limousines to use commercial global positioning system technology which takes into account the minimum clearance, weight restriction, or turning radius of the motor vehicle.
Title
Requires stretch limousines to use commercial global positioning system technology which takes into account the minimum clearance, weight restriction, or turning radius of the motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.11 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.76 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6187C |
2020-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.8 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.8 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06187 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.11