NY A09076 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines military service to include the United States Merchant Marine Academy.
Title
Redefines military service to include the United States Merchant Marine Academy.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.300 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.187 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | substituted for a9076 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | referred to education |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.305 |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted by s7152 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.187 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07152 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.300