NY A09099 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the eligibility of Ronald Stroh to take the competitive civil service examination to be placed, contingent on his scores, on the eligibility list for appointment as a full-time police officer for the town of New Paltz, in the county of Ulster.
Title
Relates to the eligibility of Ronald Stroh to take the competitive civil service examination to be placed, contingent on his scores, on the eligibility list for appointment as a full-time police officer for the town of New Paltz, in the county of Ulster.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.114 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.791 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6802 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.712 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06802 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9099