NY A09154 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - signed chap.291
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - signed chap.291
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Newburgh, Orange county, to establish a road improvement district in the Ridge Hudson Valley development area.
Title
Authorizes the town of Newburgh, Orange county, to establish a road improvement district in the Ridge Hudson Valley development area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | signed chap.291 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.995 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8494 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.188 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.188 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | print number 9154a |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08494 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - signed chap.291