NY A09299 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of liquid nicotine to minors under the age of eighteen across the state and under the age of twenty-one in the city of New York; requires containers of electronic liquid to be child resistant.
Title
Prohibits the sale of liquid nicotine to minors under the age of eighteen across the state and under the age of twenty-one in the city of New York; requires containers of electronic liquid to be child resistant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | signed chap.542 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.565 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7027C |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 9299d |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9299c |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9299b |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.853 |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | print number 9299a |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07027 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9299D