NY A09503 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid to Localities Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid to Localities Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Assembly | THRU LINE VETO MEMO.35 |
2020-04-15 | Assembly | LINE VETO MEMO.9 |
2020-04-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.53 |
2020-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-04-01 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-04-01 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-04-01 | Senate | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2020-04-01 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.17 |
2020-04-01 | Senate | substituted for a9503c |
2020-04-01 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.634 |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 7503C |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 7503B |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 7503A |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | substituted by s7503c |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.17 |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | reported |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | print number 9503c |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | print number 9503b |
2020-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | print number 9503a |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07503 (Same As) 2020-04-15 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.35