NY A09506 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - print number 9506c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - print number 9506c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that in a FOIL proceeding, the court shall assess against an agency reasonable attorneys' fees and other litigation costs incurred when a person substantially prevails unless the court finds otherwise.
Title
Establishes that in a FOIL proceeding, the court shall assess against an agency reasonable attorneys' fees and other litigation costs incurred when a person substantially prevails unless the court finds otherwise.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | print number 9506c |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | print number 9506b |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | print number 9506a |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06949 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means