NY A09523 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to anatomical gifts; provides for anatomical gift duties of hospitals and procurement organizations; makes technical corrections.
Title
Relates to anatomical gifts; provides for anatomical gift duties of hospitals and procurement organizations; makes technical corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.45 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-03-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-03-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.443 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | substituted for a9523 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.20 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | substituted by s6941 |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.443 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06941 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.45