NY A09538 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notice of health consumer assistance.
Title
Relates to notice of health consumer assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | approval memo.28 |
2020-12-02 | Senate | signed chap.318 |
2020-11-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.311 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7241 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.412 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-24 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07241 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - approval memo.28