NY A09540 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s6939a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s6939a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Erie to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Christopher J. Lysy, Kristin M. Rozycki, Marc J. Bristow, Daniel E. Walczak, Thomas Van Wie and Donald Hoelscher who are deputy sheriffs employed by such county.
Title
Authorizes the county of Erie to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Christopher J. Lysy, Kristin M. Rozycki, Marc J. Bristow, Daniel E. Walczak, Thomas Van Wie and Donald Hoelscher who are deputy sheriffs employed by such county.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s6939a |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.176 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.176 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | print number 9540a |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06939 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.433