NY A09543 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes earning at least eighteen credits from a program registered by the state education department from a degree-granting higher education institution as a condition on which the merit board may grant merit time.
Title
Includes earning at least eighteen credits from a program registered by the state education department from a degree-granting higher education institution as a condition on which the merit board may grant merit time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.190 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.190 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | print number 9543a |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2020-01-24 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07633 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES