NY A09563 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s7207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s7207
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requirements for notice to local governments, community organizations and other interested parties of the potential for significant service reductions at certain state-operated hospitals.
Title
Relates to requirements for notice to local governments, community organizations and other interested parties of the potential for significant service reductions at certain state-operated hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s7207 |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.669 |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-26 | Assembly | print number 9563a |
2018-01-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07207 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.318