NY A09564 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.237
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making certain technical corrections relating to the UCC revisions.
Title
Relates to making certain technical corrections relating to the UCC revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.237 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.811 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6179A |
2018-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.686 |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06179 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9564