NY A09574 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7775
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7775
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants the village of Farmingdale retroactive real property tax exempt status for lots located at 254 Main Street, village of Farmingdale, town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau.
Title
Grants the village of Farmingdale retroactive real property tax exempt status for lots located at 254 Main Street, village of Farmingdale, town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7775 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.327 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | print number 9574c |
2018-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | print number 9574b |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | print number 9574a |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07775 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.439