NY A09599 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the state shall develop certain procedures for the New York state grants gateway.
Title
Provides that the state shall develop certain procedures for the New York state grants gateway.
Sponsors
Asm. James Brennan [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-29 | Senate | vetoed memo.575 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1475 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7340 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.207 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.207 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07340 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9599