NY A09606 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting Uniondale Land Trust to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Title
Relates to permitting Uniondale Land Trust to file an application for certain real property tax exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.191 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.130 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | substituted for a9606a |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.711 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 7586A |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s7586a |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.130 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | print number 9606a |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07586 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.191