NY A09622 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the ability of the county of Albany to impose and collect taxes on occupancy of hotel or motel rooms in Albany county.
Title
Extends the ability of the county of Albany to impose and collect taxes on occupancy of hotel or motel rooms in Albany county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.134 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2109 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7536 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1016 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-26 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07536 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9622