NY A09646 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.136
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.136
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the building inspector in the town of Wilson, county of Niagara, to reside outside of such town.
Title
Relates to authorizing the building inspector in the town of Wilson, county of Niagara, to reside outside of such town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.136 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.941 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7053A |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1017 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | print number 9646a |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07053 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9646A